Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cirilo Cardinal de Alameda y Brea, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1781BornTorrejón de Velasco, Spain
1805²23.4ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
10 Jul 183150.0SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
30 Sep 183150.2ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
12 Mar 183250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
7 Mar 184967.6SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Apr 184967.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Jun 185775.9SelectedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
3 Aug 185776.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
15 Mar 185876.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 187290.9DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cirilo de Alameda y Brea (VIAF: 89733341)
Cirilo Cardinal de Alameda y Brea O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 40.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 163, and Page 558
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 219
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 148, Number 808
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 9
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1858

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jul 2016