Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Sancto Mathía Sáenz de Mañozca y Murillo

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

Note/Previous Titular See: (last appointment after death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1611³BornMéxico
5 Sep 166150.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
24 Aug 166251.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
27 Feb 166857.0AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
13 Jun 166857.3InstalledBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
13 Feb 167564.0DiedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
14 Apr 167564.2SelectedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
17 Jun 167564.3ConfirmedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Juan de Sancto Mathía Sáenz de Mañozca y Murillo:
Bishop Juan de Sancto Mathía Sáenz de Mañozca y Murillo (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 215, and Page 382
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 206, and Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015