Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio de Alarcón, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹BornCastillo de Garcimuñoz
22 Dec 157619.0ProfessedMember of Agostiniani Scalzi
29 Apr 162466.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
Jul 1624³66.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
Aug 1624³66.6DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio de Alarcón:
Bishop Gregorio de Alarcón O.A.D. , Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ab/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,798
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 206
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 145, Number 923
  • bd: CB, 24 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014