Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Luis Lucas Peña Gómez

Bishop Emeritus of Holguín, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1929 Born
26 Jun 195525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
12 Jan 197040.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba
12 Jan 197040.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Novaliciana
19 Mar 197040.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novaliciana
8 Jan 197949.2AppointedBishop of Holguín, Cuba
14 Nov 200576.0RetiredBishop of Holguín, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Héctor Luis Lucas Peña Gómez
Bishop Héctor Luis Lucas Peña Gómez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Holguín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelasco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Holguín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast