Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique-Augustin Dufêtre

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1796BornLyon
7 Mar 181922.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 184246.4SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
27 Jan 184346.8ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
12 Mar 184346.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
21 Mar 184346.9InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
6 Nov 186064.6DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Augustin Dufêtre:
Bishop Dominique-Augustin Dufêtre (born , died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013