Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustache Du Lis

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹Born
17 Jul 160645.5AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
19 Nov 160645.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
17 Jun 164382.4DiedBishop of Nevers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustache Du Lis:
Bishop Eustache Du Lis (died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015