Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Séguiran

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1739BornAix-en-Provence
13 Oct 178243.4SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
16 Dec 178243.6ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
5 Jan 178343.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
17 Apr 178848.9InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
3 Apr 178949.9DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Séguiran:
Bishop Pierre de Séguiran (born , died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a bishop for 6.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016