Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal Bourbon de Vend˘me

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Cardinal-Deacon of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1523Born
5 Jul 154016.7AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
23 Jan 154420.3AppointedBishop of Saintes, France
5 May 154622.6ResignedBishop of Nevers, France
9 Jan 154824.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 154925.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Sisto
9 Mar 155026.4AppointedAdministrator of Carcassonne, France
19 Mar 155026.4ResignedBishop of Saintes, France
3 Oct 155027.0AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
15 Dec 155330.2ResignedAdministrator of Carcassonne, France
15 Jan 156137.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Crisogono
4 Oct 156542.0AppointedAdministrator of Carcassonne, France
1567²43.2ResignedAdministrator of Carcassonne, France
26 Aug 156945.9AppointedAdministrator of Beauvais, France
24 Aug 157551.9ResignedAdministrator of Beauvais, France
9 May 159066.6DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Bourbon de Vend˘me (VIAF: 42667013)
Charles Cardinal Bourbon de Vend˘me (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFertÚ-sous-Jouare
Death PlacePrison, Fontenay le Comte
Buried Place (Original)Carthusian, Monastery, Gaillon

  • a cardinal for 42.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jan 1548
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1540, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Aug 2017