Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Antoine-Alfred Lelong

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1834BornChalon-sur-Saône
19 Dec 185723.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 187742.7SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
21 Sep 187742.8ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
21 Nov 187743.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
16 Nov 190369.0DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Antoine-Alfred Lelong:
Bishop Etienne-Antoine-Alfred Lelong (born , died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013