Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Paul Marie Moutel, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1938BornVarades
22 Dec 196224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
19 Jul 198850.4AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
16 Oct 198850.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
22 Jul 199759.4AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
1 Sep 199759.5InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
11 May 199860.2DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Paul Marie Moutel:
Archbishop Michel Paul Marie Moutel P.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,822
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015