Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Bertrand (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1299BornColombier, France
20 Jan 133535.8AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
5 Mar 133939.9AppointedBishop of Arras, France
19 May 134445.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
19 May 134445.1Elevated to Cardinal
Jan 1353²53.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
13 Jul 136162.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Bertrand (Jr.):
Pierre Cardinal Bertrand (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 17.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 May 1344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015