Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Antoine de Tinseau

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1697BornBesançon
20 Apr 174548.0SelectedBishop of Belley, France
19 Jul 174548.2ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
12 Sep 174548.3Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
1 Feb 174648.7InstalledBishop of Belley, France
4 Apr 175153.9SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
2 Jul 175154.2ResignedBishop of Belley, France
19 Jul 175154.2ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
24 Sep 178285.4DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Antoine de Tinseau:
Bishop Jean-Antoine de Tinseau (born , died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118, and Page 312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015