Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Édouard Bargedé

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹BornCorbigny
3 Sep 170554.6SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
22 Mar 170655.2ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
2 May 170655.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
13 Jun 170655.4InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
20 Jul 171968.5DiedBishop of Nevers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Édouard Bargedé:
Bishop Édouard Bargedé (born 1651, died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jun 2015