Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antoine de Feurs

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Nevers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 May 1505AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
17 Dec 1505ResignedBishop-Elect of Nevers, France
12 Sep 1507DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Feurs
Father Antoine de Feurs (died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Nevers

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 1 May 2018

Quantcast