Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustave-Lazare Garnier

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1857BornChâtillon-en-Bazois
17 Dec 188124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nevers, France
27 May 191659.2AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
25 Jul 191659.3Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
8 Aug 191659.4InstalledBishop of Luçon, France
30 Jan 194082.8DiedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Gustave-Lazare Garnier:
Bishop Gustave-Lazare Garnier (born , died ) Bishop of Luçon

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013