Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Naudo

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1794BornLes Angles
14 May 181823.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 183439.7SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
30 Sep 183439.9ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
9 Nov 183440.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
24 Jun 184247.7SelectedArchbishop of Avignon, France
22 Jul 184247.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Avignon, France
23 Apr 184853.5DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Paul Naudo:
Archbishop Paul Naudo (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 100, and Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013