Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand Tissandier

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1331AppointedBishop of Apt, France
5 Jun 1332AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
15 Mar 1339AppointedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand Tissandier
Bishop Bertrand Tissandier , Bishop of Nevers

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 95, and Page 140
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast