Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Neufchâtel

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Titular See: (Avignon obedience, Clement VII)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1340¹Born
10 Feb 137131.1AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
27 Aug 137232.6AppointedBishop of Toul, France
4 May 137333.3InstalledBishop of Toul, France
23 Dec 138343.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
23 Dec 138343.9Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1392³52.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
4 Oct 139858.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Neufchâtel
Jean Cardinal de Neufchâtel (born 1340, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeufchatel, Switzerland
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Carthusian, Church, Villeneuve-lès-Avignon

  • a cardinal for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1383
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,925
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 369, and Page 503

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast