Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Théodore-Augustin Forcade, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1816Born
16 Mar 183923.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Mar 184630.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Japan
27 Mar 184630.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
21 Feb 184730.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
Jan 1852³35.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Japan
8 Apr 185337.0SelectedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
12 Sep 185337.5ConfirmedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
15 Dec 186044.7SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
18 Mar 186145.0ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
29 Mar 187357.0SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
25 Jul 187357.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
18 Sep 187357.5InstalledArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
12 Sep 188569.5DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Théodore-Augustin Forcade (VIAF: 249201619)
Archbishop Théodore-Augustin Forcade M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVersailles

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 113, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 416
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017