Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Germain

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1430AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
20 Aug 1436AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
2 Feb 1461DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Germain
Bishop Jean Germain (died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112, and Page 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast