Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Achille Marie Joseph Glorieux

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Beverlacum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1910Born
23 Dec 193323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lille, France
29 Jun 193424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
196655.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
19 Sep 196959.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beverlacum
19 Sep 196959.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Syria
9 Nov 196959.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Beverlacum
3 Aug 197363.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
198473.7ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
27 Sep 199989.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Achille Marie Joseph Glorieux (VIAF: 186797199)
Archbishop Achille Marie Joseph Glorieux (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Egypt, Arab Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoubaix, Diocese of Lille, France
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopTrinità dei Monti, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLille, Diocese of Lille, France

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast