Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Émile André Marie Maury

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1907Born
12 Mar 193224.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Agen, France
29 Jun 193225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Agen, France
20 Dec 195750.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
20 Dec 195750.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Elis
3 Feb 195850.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elis
8 Jul 195952.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
9 Jul 195952.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Dakar
23 Sep 196053.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Western Africa
28 Dec 196154.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Sénégal
11 Jun 196558.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
11 Jun 196558.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
11 Jun 196558.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
196759.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
196759.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
25 Jun 196861.0AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
16 Dec 197265.5ResignedArchbishop of Reims, France
5 Jan 199486.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Émile André Marie Maury
Archbishop Jean Émile André Marie Maury (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgen, Diocese of Agen
Ordained Deaconla Médaille Miraculeuse, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Fourvière, Basilica, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Death PlaceToulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast