Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edoardo Rovida

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Tauromenium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1927 BornAlessandria
29 Jun 195022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
31 Jul 197143.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tauromenium
31 Jul 197143.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
10 Oct 197144.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tauromenium
13 Aug 197750.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
7 Mar 198153.5AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
26 Jan 198557.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
7 Mar 198759.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein
15 Mar 199365.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
12 Oct 200275.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Rovida:
Archbishop Edoardo Rovida (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Portugal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013