Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Farano

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1921BornTrani
3 Jun 194422.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 197352.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cluentum
8 Aug 197352.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Indonesia
30 Sep 197352.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cluentum
25 Aug 197958.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
14 Aug 198665.0AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
12 Feb 199775.5RetiredArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
17 Jan 200886.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Farano
Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Farano (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016