Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emile Maurice Guerry

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France

Titular Archbishop of Octava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1891Born
22 Jul 192331.8Ordained PriestPriest of Grenoble, France
31 May 194048.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cambrai, France
31 May 194048.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
25 Jul 194048.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
2 Dec 195261.1SucceededArchbishop of Cambrai, France
15 Feb 196674.3RetiredArchbishop of Cambrai, France
15 Feb 196674.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Octava
11 Mar 196977.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Emile Maurice Guerry (VIAF: 4980833)
Archbishop Emile Maurice Guerry (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenoble

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast