Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Sauveur Ferdinand van Gaver, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1921Born
6 Oct 194625.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Dec 194625.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Mar 196544.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nakhorn-Rajasima, Thailand
22 Mar 196544.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Capra
22 Jul 196544.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capra
18 Dec 196544.8AppointedBishop of Nakhorn-Rajasima, Thailand
30 May 197756.2ResignedBishop of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand
4 May 199372.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Alain Sauveur Ferdinand van Gaver (VIAF: 79282947)
Bishop Alain Sauveur Ferdinand van Gaver M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Ratchasima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, Diocese of Marseille, France
Ordained DeaconMissions Étrangères, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSaint-Ignace, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Rosary, Church, Bangkok, Vicariate Apostolic of Bangkok
Death PlaceMarseille, Archdiocese of Marseille, France

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast