Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Auguste-Marie Langer, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1920Born
21 Dec 194626.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Feb 196746.1AppointedBishop of Nakhorn-Sawan, Thailand
13 Apr 196746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nakhorn-Sawan, Thailand
24 May 197655.4ResignedBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
27 Mar 198968.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Michel-Auguste-Marie Langer
Bishop Michel-Auguste-Marie Langer M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Sawan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThévray, France

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast