Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel José Rubio y Salinas

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1703BornColmenar Viejo, Spain
1730¹26.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 174744.4SelectedArchbishop of México, Federal District
29 Jan 174844.5ConfirmedArchbishop of México, Federal District
24 Aug 174946.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
3 Jul 176562.0DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel José Rubio y Salinas:
Archbishop Manuel José Rubio y Salinas (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 67, Number 317
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015