Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Louis Charbonnaux, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mysore

Titular Bishop of Iasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1806BornLa Guerche-de-Bretagne, France
5 Jun 183024.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jun 184135.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India
15 Jun 184135.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Iasus
1845²38.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mysore, India
29 Jun 184539.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iasus
3 Apr 185044.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mysore, India
23 Jun 187367.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Mysore, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Louis Charbonnaux:
Bishop Etienne-Louis Charbonnaux M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mysore

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013