Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Phayao Manisap

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1929Born
23 Nov 195829.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 197747.8AppointedBishop of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand
3 Sep 197748.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand
30 Nov 200677.3RetiredBishop of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand
3 Nov 200778.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nakhon Ratchasima, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joachim Phayao Manisap
Bishop Joachim Phayao Manisap (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Ratchasima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChanthaburi

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2006
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast