Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pedro Portocarrero y Guzmán

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640¹BornMadrid, Spain
27 Aug 169151.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
4 Nov 169151.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
12 Nov 169151.8AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
1705²65.0DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Portocarrero y Guzmán:
Patriarch Pedro Portocarrero y Guzmán (born 1640, died 1705) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228, and Page 396
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 233, Number 1,448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015