Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Domínguez y Toledo

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1680BornTalavera
10 May 172848.3AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
25 Jul 172848.5Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
2 Jun 174363.3DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián Domínguez y Toledo:
Bishop Julián Domínguez y Toledo (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,624
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 404
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,850
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,647
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 46, Number 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013