Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

Archidioecesis Pondicheriensis et Cuddalorensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antony Anandarayar, Archbishop
  • Michael Augustine, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 7 August 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 15,250 (5,890 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.pondyarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 193, Cathedral Str., Puduchcheri 605001, India
  • Telephone: (0413)33.47.48
  • Fax: 33.99.11

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry
1776ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Pondicherry
1836ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry Vicariate Apostolic of Pondicherry
Archdiocese of Pondicherry
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pondicherry Archdiocese of Pondicherry
7 June 1887ElevatedArchdiocese of Pondicherry (became a Metropolitan)
1 September 1889Territory LostArchdiocese of Pondicherry
26 May 1930Territory LostDiocese of Kumbakonam
Diocese of Mysore
Archdiocese of Pondicherry
Diocese of Salem (erected)
Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore
7 August 1953Name ChangedArchdiocese of Pondicherry Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Pondicherry
1950147,5003,019,2754.9%65481131,3051245050ap1951
Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore
1970163,2623,417,0524.8%86861,8984659450ap1971
1980206,2454,076,0005.1%95161111,8582778759ap1981
1990278,5004,765,0005.8%114111252,2282482566ap1991
1999277,3506,326,5704.4%131291601,7334292581ap2000
2000283,6106,333,8304.5%136251611,7614393085ap2001
2001288,6106,363,8304.5%131231541,8743979987ap2002
2002293,6106,393,8304.6%135231581,8584184187ap2003
2003299,6676,413,9454.7%137261631,8384691087ap2004
2004305,3066,522,7564.7%139301691,8064991289ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Jun 2014