Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestre García Escalona

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647²BornAlmonacid
6 Feb 170255.0AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
30 Apr 170255.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
6 Mar 171467.1SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
13 Jun 171467.4ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
20 Apr 172982.3DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvestre García Escalona:
Bishop Silvestre García Escalona (born 1647, died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183, and Page 339
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 22, Number 19
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015