Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Dali [Tali]

Dioecesis Talianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tali [Dali]
22 November 1929ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Tali [Dali] (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Tali [Dali]
13 December 1931ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Tali [Dali] Prefecture Apostolic of Tali [Dali]
Diocese of Dali [Tali]
9 December 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Tali [Dali] Diocese of Dali [Tali]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Dali [Tali]
19685,0973,212,339.2%4141124313015ap1971

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 May 2013