Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Pianazzi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

Titular Bishop of Usula

Titular See: (Luigi Maria di Gesù)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1743Born
10 Jan 176218.1ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
30 Mar 178440.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
30 Mar 178440.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
18 Sep 178541.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
2 Apr 180258.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pianazzi
Bishop Luigi Pianazzi O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuroscopa, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,785, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast