Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Matos, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1701³BornSevilla, Spain
11 Feb 175452.1AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
20 Oct 175452.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
24 Feb 176765.1DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Matos:
Bishop Manuel de Matos O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,480
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 72, Number 351
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 56
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015