Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Pio di Savoia

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1622BornFerrara
2 Mar 165431.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165431.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
2 Aug 165533.3AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
5 Sep 165533.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
26 Feb 166340.8ResignedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
11 Feb 166441.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
14 Nov 166745.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
28 Jan 167552.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
1 Dec 168159.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
15 Feb 168360.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
13 Feb 168966.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pio di Savoia:
Carlo Cardinal Pio di Savoia (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
  • a cardinal for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1654
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,051
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015