Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Giacomo Sinibaldi

Deceased

President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1766BornSant'Elpidio
7 Jun 180033.9Ordained PriestPriest
181447.5AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
13 Aug 182155.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
19 Aug 182155.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
27 Jan 184376.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
2 Sep 184377.1DiedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo Sinibaldi:
Patriarch Giovanni Giacomo Sinibaldi (born , died ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 161, and Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013