Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincento Garofali, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1760Born
19 Jun 178222.3ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
24 Feb 183272.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
1 Apr 183272.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
3 Feb 183979.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

MicroData Summary for Vincento Garofali (VIAF: 19514407)
Archbishop Vincento Garofali C.R.L. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 11
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast