Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Paolo Pochettini di Serravalle

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1782³BornChambery
8 Jun 180522.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 182441.6SelectedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
12 Jul 182442.0ConfirmedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
18 Jul 182442.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
30 Mar 183754.7DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Paolo Pochettini di Serravalle:
Bishop Luigi Paolo Pochettini di Serravalle (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013