Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominico Secondi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Assisi

Titular Archbishop of Bostra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1772¹BornBarchi
1830²58.0AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 Jul 183260.5AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
26 Aug 183260.6Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
5 Jun 184169.4ResignedBishop of Assisi, Italy
15 Jul 184169.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
3 Apr 184270.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominico Secondi (VIAF: 89413078)
Archbishop Dominico Secondi O.F.M. Conv. (born 1772, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Assisi

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 91, and Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Aug 2016