Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Desiderio Mennone, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1764BornMirabello Sannitico
15 Sep 177915.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Apr 178622.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Sep 178723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Mar 182460.1SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
24 May 182460.3ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
26 May 182460.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
11 Apr 182561.2DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Desiderio Mennone:
Bishop Desiderio Mennone C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 231
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013