Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Bindi Sergardi

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1772³Born
24 Feb 179926.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 182452.7AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
27 Dec 182452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
18 Nov 184371.6DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bindi Sergardi (VIAF: 89100165)
Bishop Giovanni Bindi Sergardi (born , died ) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast