Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Lepore

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1773BornTrani
23 Sep 179724.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 182753.6SelectedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
9 Apr 182753.7ConfirmedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
16 Apr 182753.8Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
26 Jun 185178.0DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Lepore:
Bishop Pietro Lepore (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013