Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Tosi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1763BornBusto Arsizio
29 May 179026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
2 Feb 182258.5SelectedBishop of Pavia, Italy
16 May 182359.8ConfirmedBishop of Pavia, Italy
18 May 182359.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
13 Dec 184582.4DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Tosi
Bishop Luigi Tosi (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 May 2016