Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Giove, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1773BornSanteramo
21 May 179724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
21 Mar 183258.9SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
2 Jul 183259.2ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
15 Jul 183259.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
18 Nov 183461.6SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
19 Dec 183461.7ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
24 Jun 184875.2DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Giove
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Giove O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117, and Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Jul 2016