Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1765BornAvellinen
19 Dec 178924.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 182660.6SelectedBishop of San Severo, Italy
3 Jul 182660.7ConfirmedBishop of San Severo, Italy
9 Jul 182660.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
27 Jul 182963.8DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Rossi:
Bishop Bernardo Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013