Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Antonio Cardinal Benvenuti

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1765BornBelvedere
20 Sep 178823.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 182661.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 182863.6AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
15 Dec 182863.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 182863.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
25 Jan 182963.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
14 Nov 183873.5DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Benvenuti:
Cardinal Giovanni Antonio Benvenuti (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013