Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1772Born
10 Jan 179624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 May 182351.3AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
18 May 182351.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
14 Dec 183361.9DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Bozzi
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosate

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018